NH SB179 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB179
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to pharmacist administration of vaccines.
Title
Relative to pharmacist administration of vaccines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB179 (Carry Over) 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar