NH SB181 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to distribution of funds for education.
Title
Relative to distribution of funds for education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.90 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Hearing: 2/17/11, Room 103, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Finance, Senate Journal 5, Pg.47 |