NH SB181 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring monitoring of certain radioactive air pollutants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring monitoring of certain radioactive air pollutants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-31SenateHearing: 02/07/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback