NH SB182 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB182
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a duty to report when another person has suffered grave physical harm.
Title
Relative to a duty to report when another person has suffered grave physical harm.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Hearing: 03/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB182 (Carry Over) 2019-12-03 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study