NH SB185 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 240; Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to development of the New Hampshire state rail trails plan by the department of transportation and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to development of the New Hampshire state rail trails plan by the department of transportation and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 240; Effective 07/12/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Watters Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 22-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 15
2019-05-22HouseExecutive Session: 05/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-10HouseDivision II Work Session: 05/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Finance 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 38
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1618h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 38
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1618h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 38
2019-04-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1618h (NT) for 05/08/2019 (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 11
2019-04-17HouseExecutive Session: 04/24/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0209s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0209s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSpecial Order to the Present Time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0209s, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback