NH SB186 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 11/8/11, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 11/8/11, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the exemption from the consumer protection act for certain regulated trade and commerce.
Title
Repealing the exemption from the consumer protection act for certain regulated trade and commerce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-20 | Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 11/8/11, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 43 | |
2011-09-01 | Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 9/8/11, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 36 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.89 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/11, Room 100, State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration, Senate Journal 5, Pg.47 |