NH SB186 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2019; Chapter 0162; Effective 09/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2019; Chapter 0162; Effective 09/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting a qualified veteran to obtain an additional set of special number plates.
Title
Permitting a qualified veteran to obtain an additional set of special number plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2019; Chapter 0162; Effective 09/07/2019 |
2019-06-12 | House | Enrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 19 |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 7 |
2019-05-01 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-04-23 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-04-16 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0593s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0593s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0593s, 03/07/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |