NH SB19 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB19
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2830h
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2830h
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the privacy of certain information concerning public employees.
Title
Relative to the privacy of certain information concerning public employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Sen. French Floor Amendment 0513s (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2830h |
2019-11-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2805h (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-10-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-05-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/01/2019 09:35 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 05/01/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/24/2019 08:45 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-04-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 68 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0381s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Sen. French Floor Amendment # 2019-0513s, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0381s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Special Order to After Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0381s, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 01/22/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:45 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB19 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2830h