NH SB190 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - II. Remainder Effective 09/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - II. Remainder Effective 09/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to apportionment of sales under the business profits tax and the apportionment of dividends under the business enterprise tax and establishing a committee to study the apportionment of gross business profits under the business profits tax.
Title
Relative to apportionment of sales under the business profits tax and the apportionment of dividends under the business enterprise tax and establishing a committee to study the apportionment of gross business profits under the business profits tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-09 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 09/06/2019 |
2019-09-09 | Senate | I. Sections 1 and 2 Effective 01/01/2021 |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 09/06/2019; Chapter 0342 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2671e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2671e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2531c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2531c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 4 |
2019-06-19 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2531c Filed 06/13/2019; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/17/2019, 01:00 pm, Room 100, State House |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/17/2019, 10:30 am, Room 100, State House |
2019-06-13 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Malloy, Griffith, Major, Abrami 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 2 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Almy): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 2 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators D'Allesandro, Dietsch, Birdsell; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2182h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 27 |
2019-06-06 | House | Amendment # 2019-2182h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 27 |
2019-05-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2182h (NT) for 06/05/2019 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 22 |
2019-05-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-05-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-04-24 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-04-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/24/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-04-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/10/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 04/09/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0624s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0624s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0624s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |