NH SB194 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/15/11; Chapter 0199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/15/11; Chapter 0199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the transfer of real and personal property from the former department of regional community-technical colleges to the board of trustees of the community college system of New Hampshire and relative to the tax exempt status of real estate and personal property owned by the community college system of New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to the transfer of real and personal property from the former department of regional community-technical colleges to the board of trustees of the community college system of New Hampshire and relative to the tax exempt status of real estate and personal property owned by the community college system of New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Bragdon [R] | Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] |
Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] | Rep. Adam Schroadter [R] | Rep. Edwin Smith [R] |
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/15/11; Chapter 0199 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1726 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Stiles Concurs with House Amendment #2145h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.550 | |
2011-06-01 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2145h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1626-1627 | |
2011-06-01 | House Amendment #2145h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1626-1627 | |
2011-05-25 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2145h (New Title); House Calendar 43, PG.1528-1529 | |
2011-05-25 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2145h(NT) for June 1 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 43, PG.1496 | |
2011-05-18 | House Continued Executive Session: 5/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-04-27 | House Executive Session: 5/17/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205-207 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-04-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/21/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-03-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 30, PG.1036 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 9, Pg.162 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0809s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.145 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. Rausch Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.145 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. D’Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.115 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment Not Voted On | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2011-0809s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.115 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.115 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.115 | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Hearing: 3/8/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 8, Pg.82 |