NH SB194 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0092; Effective 06/20/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0092; Effective 06/20/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the department of health and human services to implement the Medicaid family planning expansion.
Title
Requiring the department of health and human services to implement the Medicaid family planning expansion.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Rep. Sharon Nordgren [D] | Rep. Susan Emerson [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Rep. Laurie Harding [D] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0092; Effective 06/20/2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled 5/2/13 |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 212-120; House Journal 41, PG.1415-1417 |
2013-05-08 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Comerford); House Journal 41, PG.1386 |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1197 |
2013-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 4/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-04-09 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 4/17/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ==RECESSED== |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 31, PG.1075 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 3/5/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services; Senate Journal 6 |