NH SB194 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing online voter registration.
Title
Authorizing online voter registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. David Cote [D] |
Rep. Wayne Burton [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Andrew White [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |