NH SB196 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Vetoed by Governor 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to non-academic surveys administered by a public school to its students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to non-academic surveys administered by a public school to its students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Concur (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 218 N: 150 NV: 10 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Adopt Amendment (Y: 155 N: 215 NV: 8 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0313s (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateVetoed by Governor 07/12/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Kahn Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1802h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 218-150 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 25
2019-05-23HouseFLAM # 2019-1848h (Rep. Shaw): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 155-215 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 25
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1802h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 25
2019-05-08HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-08HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1802h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 8
2019-04-18HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0313s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0313s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSpecial Order to After Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0313s, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=474&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB196
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=490&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=490
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=490
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=17&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0196&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB196&ddlsponsors=&lsr=474
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=18&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0196&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB196&ddlsponsors=&lsr=474
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=203&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0196&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB196&ddlsponsors=&lsr=474
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=204&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0196&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB196&ddlsponsors=&lsr=474
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=215&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0196&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB196&ddlsponsors=&lsr=474

Bill Comments

feedback