NH SB2 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB2
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing the rates of the business profits tax and the business enterprise tax.
Title
Reducing the rates of the business profits tax and the business enterprise tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Herb Vadney [R] |
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 46 |
2017-10-30 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-08-15 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/19/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | Executive Session: 04/20/2017 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 11 P. 27 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1013s, Regular Calendar 14Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2017-1013s, Regular Calendar 14Y-8N, Amendment Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2017-1013s; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-1013s, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0804s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2017-0804s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0804s, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing: 02/22/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB2 (Carry Over) 2017-10-30 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)