NH SB203 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to permissible uses of electronic benefit transfer (EBT) cards.
Title
Relative to permissible uses of electronic benefit transfer (EBT) cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - Interim Study (Y: 188 N: 161 NV: 15 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-0) |
2014-09-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/15/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-09-05 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-09-04 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/11/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-09-04 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 9/9/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-09-04 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/9/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-06-04 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/10/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-05-21 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/3/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-05-07 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-161 |
2014-05-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2014-05-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 34 |
2014-04-18 | House | Executive Session: 4/29/14 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 4/15/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0877s, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 20Y-3N; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0877s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Special Ordered to the call of the Chair, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0877s, 3/13/14; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/4/14, Room 103, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Finance |