NH SB203 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 202; Effective 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 202; Effective 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making modifications to legal requirements for wetlands and environmental council administrative appeals.
Title
Making modifications to legal requirements for wetlands and environmental council administrative appeals.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 202; Effective 09/08/2019 |
2019-06-12 | House | Enrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 18 |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 6 |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0368s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0368s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0368s, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |