NH SB207 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Law Without Signature 07/16/19; Chapter 249; Effective 07/16/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Law Without Signature 07/16/19; Chapter 249; Effective 07/16/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to rules adopted by the department of environmental services pursuant to the 2014 report of the coastal risks and hazards commission.
Title
Relative to rules adopted by the department of environmental services pursuant to the 2014 report of the coastal risks and hazards commission.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Rep. Peter Somssich [D] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Cali-Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Law Without Signature 07/16/19; Chapter 249; Effective 07/16/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1602h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 4 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-1602h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 4 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1602h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4 |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/23/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-04-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/09/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0652s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0652s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0652s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |