NH SB209 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB209
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2768h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2768h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to create a New Hampshire recovery memorial.
Title
Establishing a commission to create a New Hampshire recovery memorial.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. John Cloutier [D] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] | Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] |
Rep. Joelle Martin [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2768h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/16/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-09-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-08-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/04/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-05-29 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 05/21/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-04-30 | House | Public Hearing: 05/15/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/13/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 11:15 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB209 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2768h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)