NH SB212 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Sen. Hennessey Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to limited driving privilege after revocation or suspension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to limited driving privilege after revocation or suspension.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSen. Hennessey Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1778h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1778h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019
2019-05-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1778h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 7
2019-05-01HouseExecutive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-04-23HousePublic Hearing: 04/30/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-06SenateHearing: 03/19/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback