NH SB217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2019; Chapter 0040; Effective 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2019; Chapter 0040; Effective 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Marking the Lafayette Trail in New Hampshire.
Title
Marking the Lafayette Trail in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. Judy Aron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2019; Chapter 0040; Effective 07/19/2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-17 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 102 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 13 |
2019-05-08 | House | Special Order to first item of business (Rep. Cloutier): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 13 |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 14-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 17 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0825s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0825s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0825s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |