NH SB220 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB220
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of mental illness for purposes of mental health services.
Title
Relative to the definition of mental illness for purposes of mental health services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] |
Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. Claire Rouillard [R] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/07/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 02/13/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB220 (Carry Over) 2017-09-22 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study