NH SB222 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB222
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure of pharmacy benefits managers.
Title
Relative to licensure of pharmacy benefits managers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB222 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8