NH SB226 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - V. Remainder Effective 08/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to registration of pharmacy benefit managers, and reestablishing the commission to study greater transparency in pharmaceutical costs and drug rebate programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to registration of pharmacy benefit managers, and reestablishing the commission to study greater transparency in pharmaceutical costs and drug rebate programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 208 N: 143 NV: 14 Abs: 33) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13SenateV. Remainder Effective 08/12/2019
2019-08-13SenateIV. Section 9 of this act shall take effect as provided in Section 10
2019-08-13SenateIII. Section 7 Effective 06/30/2020
2019-08-13SenateII. Section 6 Effective 11/01/2020
2019-08-13SenateI. Sections 1-4 Effective 01/01/2020
2019-08-13SenateSigned by the Governor on 08/12/2019; Chapter 320
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2669e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-09HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2669e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2610c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2610c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 208-143 06/27/2019
2019-06-20HouseConference Committee Report # 2019-2610c Filed 06/13/2019; House Amendment + New Amendment
2019-06-19SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 11:30 am, Room 103, State House
2019-06-13SenateConferee Change; Senator Reagan Replaces Senator French; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-13SenateConferee Change; Senator Chandley Replaces Senator Morgan; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-13HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Butler, Hunt, Abel, Indruk 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 45
2019-06-13HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 45
2019-06-13SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Soucy, Morgan, French; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-13SenateSen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2128h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 35
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2128h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 35
2019-05-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2128h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 11
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-05-08HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/16/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-24HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/02/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0871s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0871s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0871s, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/30/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback