NH SB233 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2019; Chapter 0157; Effective 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2019; Chapter 0157; Effective 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the classification of certain state employee positions.
Title
Relative to the classification of certain state employee positions.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2019; Chapter 0157; Effective 07/01/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1404h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 14 |
2019-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2019-1404h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 14 |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1404h (NT) for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 9 |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Calendar 8 |