NH SB237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB237
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-05 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-05 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the office of cost containment.
Title
Relative to the office of cost containment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-09-24 | House | Executive Session: 10/29/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-08-20 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-06-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/27/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-06-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/11/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-04-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-04-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 04/18/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 11 P. 74 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Special Order to 03/28/2019, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/21/2019 Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB237 (Carry Over) 2019-11-05 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)