NH SB238 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 279; Effective 09/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 279; Effective 09/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the registration of motor vehicles owned by veterans.
Title
Relative to the registration of motor vehicles owned by veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 279; Effective 09/17/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1753h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 23 |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment # 2019-1753h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 23 |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1753h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 8 |
2019-05-14 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/21/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-05-01 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-04-23 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-04-16 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0621s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0621s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0621s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |