NH SB24 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 184; Effective 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to New Hampshire's regional greenhouse gas initiative program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to New Hampshire's regional greenhouse gas initiative program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 184; Effective 09/08/2019
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2163e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-29HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2163e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 50
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 12
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 7
2019-04-17HouseExecutive Session: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 68
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/22/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback