NH SB240 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 312; Effective 10/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 312; Effective 10/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reciprocal toll collection.
Title
Relative to reciprocal toll collection.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. Barbara Griffin [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] |
Rep. Thomas Southworth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 312; Effective 10/01/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2639e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2639e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 55 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1705h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 11 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-1705h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 11 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1705h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 7 |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0481s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Sen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2019-0481s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved to Remove SB 240-FN from the Consent Calendar; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |