NH SB248 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the age for sales and possession of tobacco products.
Title
Increasing the age for sales and possession of tobacco products.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Rep. Michael Cahill [D] | Rep. James MacKay [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0022s (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0022s (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-03-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-03-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/17/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2020 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 59 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0022s, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved to Reconsider the following action taken by this Body: Rescind Order to Third Reading, and Reconsider the Vote on Ought to Pass with Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0022s, Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Sen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2020-0022s, Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Amendment Adopted; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB248 (Carry Over) 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass