NH SB249 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Including the legislature as a public employer under the public employee labor relations act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Including the legislature as a public employer under the public employee labor relations act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/08/2019 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 6
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 05/01/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-04-19House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 05/02/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/18/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSpecial Order to After Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:45 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback