NH SB250 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 281; Effective 09/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 281; Effective 09/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to forgery of a certificate of insurance.
Title
Relative to forgery of a certificate of insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Morgan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Sen. French Floor Amendment 0411s (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 281; Effective 09/17/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2349h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 56 |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment # 2019-2349h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 56 |
2019-05-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2349h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 13 |
2019-05-21 | House | Executive Session: 05/28/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-05-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/28/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-05-15 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 05/21/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-05-15 | House | Public Hearing: 05/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 31 |
2019-05-02 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Warden) 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 31 |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 3 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Sen. French Floor Amendment # 2019-0411s, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Special Order to After Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |