NH SB256 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB256
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to emergency generators in certain senior housing.
Title
Relative to emergency generators in certain senior housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB256 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8