NH SB258 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - II. Remainder Effective 10/11/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to telemedicine and telehealth services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to telemedicine and telehealth services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13SenateII. Remainder Effective 10/11/2019
2019-08-13SenateI. Sections 3&4 Effective 01/01/2020
2019-08-13SenateSigned by the Governor on 08/12/2019; Chapter 321
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2643e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2643e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-13SenateSen. Sherman Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1805h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 15
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1805h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 15
2019-05-09HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1805h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 5
2019-04-30HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-17HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1036s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1036s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1036s, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14
2019-02-21SenateHearing: 03/05/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback