NH SB26 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 222; Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the New Hampshire health care quality assurance commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the New Hampshire health care quality assurance commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 222; Effective 07/12/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1665h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 13
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1665h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 13
2019-05-07HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1665h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 4
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 05/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-24HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 68
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0203s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0203s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0203s, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-15SenateHearing: 01/23/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback