NH SB261 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2019; Chapter 0158; Effective 08/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to grandparents' access to preventive and protective child care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to grandparents' access to preventive and protective child care services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/01/2019; Chapter 0158; Effective 08/30/2019
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 12
2019-05-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 3
2019-04-30HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-04-24HousePublic Hearing: 04/30/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 14
2019-02-14SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback