NH SB262 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the property interest in abandoned personal materials.
Title
Relative to the property interest in abandoned personal materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 71 |
2019-05-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1713h |
2019-05-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 17 |
2019-05-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-04-23 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-04-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0823s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0823s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0823s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |