NH SB268 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Hearing: 02/07/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Hearing: 02/07/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing in-state tuition rates at any university system of New Hampshire institution for any person registered to vote in this state.
Title
Providing in-state tuition rates at any university system of New Hampshire institution for any person registered to vote in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4 |