NH SB269 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB269
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2825h (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2825h (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the department of natural and cultural resources to perform an ecological integrity assessment.
Title
Making an appropriation to the department of natural and cultural resources to perform an ecological integrity assessment.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2825h (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-09-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/02/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB269 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2825h (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar)