NH SB27 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 185; Effective 07/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 185; Effective 07/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain unclassified positions within the department of health and human services.
Title
Relative to certain unclassified positions within the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 185; Effective 07/10/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1405h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 4 |
2019-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2019-1405h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 4 |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1405h for 05/02/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 4 |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 68 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0092s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0092s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0092s, 01/31/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |