NH SB271 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 271 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to requiring prevailing wages on state-funded public works projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to requiring prevailing wages on state-funded public works projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - OTP (Y: 213 N: 140 NV: 15 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateNotwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 271 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
2019-07-24SenateVetoed by Governor 07/19/2019
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-140 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 32
2019-04-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-04-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 10
2019-04-17HouseExecutive Session: 04/24/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-03-27House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0873s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0873s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0873s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=989&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB271
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=1011&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1011
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&v=HP&id=1011
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=54&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0271&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB271&ddlsponsors=&lsr=989
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=182&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0271&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB271&ddlsponsors=&lsr=989
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=251&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0271&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB271&ddlsponsors=&lsr=989

Bill Comments

feedback