NH SB272 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 283; Effective 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to mental health parity under the insurance laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mental health parity under the insurance laws.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 283; Effective 01/01/2020
2019-06-18HouseEnrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18
2019-06-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 51
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2139h (NT): Amendment Failed Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 51
2019-05-30HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-05-30HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2139h (NT) for 06/05/2019 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 12
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-05-01HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/07/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-02-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0391s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0391s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0391s, 02/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback