NH SB274 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the newborn home visiting program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the newborn home visiting program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseReferral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 05/02/2019
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs 05/02/2019
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1396h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019
2019-05-02HouseAmendment # 2019-1396h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019
2019-04-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1396h for 05/02/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 5
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-10HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-10HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-02-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0499s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0499s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0499s, 02/21/2019; Senate Calendar 11
2019-02-07SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback