NH SB278 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the education administration efficiency fund and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing the education administration efficiency fund and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4 |