NH SB279 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to challenges of voters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to challenges of voters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-30HouseInexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-24HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32
2014-04-16HouseExecutive Session: 4/22/2014 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2014-04-09HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 4/17/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2014-03-19HousePublic Hearing: 4/1/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2014-03-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to Election Law
2014-02-13SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg
2014-02-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/13/14; Senate Calendar 6
2014-01-28SenateHearing: 2/5/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5
2013-12-11SenateIntroduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback