NH SB28 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Enrolled 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to an active retirement system member appointment to the independent investment committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to an active retirement system member appointment to the independent investment committee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseEnrolled 05/08/2019
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019
2019-04-17HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 4
2019-04-03HouseExecutive Session: 04/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-03-26HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 68
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0206s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0206s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0206s, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-15SenateHearing: 01/23/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback