NH SB282 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 315; Effective 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to suicide prevention education in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to suicide prevention education in schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05SenateSigned by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 315; Effective 07/01/2020
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Kahn Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1845h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 13
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1845h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 13
2019-05-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1845h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 4
2019-04-18HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-04-03House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 04/09/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-03-27House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0821s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0821s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0821s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-20SenateHearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback