NH SB285 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Law Without Signature 08/03/2019; Chapter 318; Effective 10/02/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a coastal resilience and economic development program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a coastal resilience and economic development program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05SenateLaw Without Signature 08/03/2019; Chapter 318; Effective 10/02/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2245h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 22
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2245h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 22
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2245h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 8
2019-05-15HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-05-15HousePublic Hearing: 05/21/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Public Works and Highways 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 35
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1715h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 35
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1715h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 35
2019-05-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1715h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 10
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-04-10House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-04-10House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0663s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0663s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0663s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback