NH SB286 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 316; Effective 10/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 316; Effective 10/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to aggregation of electric customers by municipalities and counties.
Title
Relative to aggregation of electric customers by municipalities and counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Cali-Pitts [D] |
Rep. Patricia Klee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 316; Effective 10/01/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2635e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2635e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 54 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1946h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 21 |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment # 2019-1946h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 21 |
2019-05-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1946h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 8 |
2019-05-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-04-24 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0866s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0866s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0866s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |