NH SB287 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the commissioner of the department of environmental services to revise rules relative to perfluorinated chemical contamination in drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the commissioner of the department of environmental services to revise rules relative to perfluorinated chemical contamination in drinking water.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback