NH SB289 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - III. Remainder Effective 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - III. Remainder Effective 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to health and human services.
Title
Relative to health and human services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - OTPA (Y: 207 N: 141 NV: 17 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 07/19/2019 |
2019-07-24 | Senate | II. Sections 3-9 Effective 07/01/2019 |
2019-07-24 | Senate | I. Sections 1 & 2 Effective 09/17/2019 |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 287 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1792h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-141 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 61 |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment # 2019-1792h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 61 |
2019-05-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-05-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1792h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 15 |
2019-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 05/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1515h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 16 |
2019-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2019-1515h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 16 |
2019-05-07 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division III Work Session: 05/14/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-05-06 | House | ==RECESSED== Division III Work Session: 05/07/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Finance 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 16 |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1515h for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 10 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-10 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-10 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 12 P. 74 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1301s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Rosenwald Floor Amendment # 2019-1301s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Rosenwald Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0637s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0637s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0637s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |